U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cross
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Clerk's Notice of Filing 2255 - MT]
  • September 27, 2024: [2255 (Motion to Vacate) - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2023: [Dismiss ]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 29, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.