U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.