U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hopkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • January 25, 2023: [Pro Se Motion - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • January 20, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • January 04, 2023: [Letter - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • December 16, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • December 16, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • November 22, 2022: [Letter - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.