U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [GLACIER Court Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.