U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.