U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Emineth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.