U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chandler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Status Report]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.