U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza-Almanza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 16, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
  • September 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Warrant ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Warrant ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.