U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ridenour
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Quash ]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Quash ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Quash ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.