U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pair
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Remark - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.