U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schwindt et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 19, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement (Applicable Party) - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 16, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.