U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zito
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 20, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • September 19, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.