U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-bk-40065-
  • Case Name: DAVID DWIGHT JAMISON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • October 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.