U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Stemson v. Ultimate Logistics, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [In Limine]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 03, 2024: [Bifurcate]
  • October 03, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 04, 2023: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.