U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00101
  • Case Name: Getchell et al v. JMA Ventures, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 02, 2024: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Settlement]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 19, 2023: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • November 30, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 21, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.