U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Ashworth v. KB Orthopedics, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • November 22, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 03, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.