U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ampude
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 04, 2022: [1 - Interpreter Used - Use Only with Other Event]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.