U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Eagle Bear Inc. v. Blackfeet Indian Nation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 16, 2023: [Errata - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Errata - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 23, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • December 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Answer to Intervenor Complaint]
  • December 20, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 14, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [Appendix - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2022: [Intervenor Complaint]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 29, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • November 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Intervene]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 11, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [USM 285 Return Executed - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.