U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Buday et al v. Bear's Home Renovation and Repairs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 19, 2023: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [Answer to Counterclaim]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 13, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • December 05, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 21, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 14, 2022: [Counterclaim]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 30, 2022: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.