U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-00079
  • Case Name: DeCaccia v. Capt. Bragg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order/Judgment - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Default Judgment - SDM]
  • January 23, 2023: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • January 20, 2023: [Supplement - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • January 18, 2023: [Entry of Default]
  • January 06, 2023: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.