U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burshia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.