U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00095
  • Case Name: The Estate of Michael Lee alexander, Jr. (Anthony Gallagher, Personal Representative) v. Slaughter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 03, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 03, 2023: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 28, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.