U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Pacific Hide and Fur Depot v. Total Quality Logistics, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 23, 2023: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 13, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment - Default]
  • January 10, 2023: [Entry of Default]
  • January 04, 2023: [Affidavit of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Parties - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 02, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 05, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 05, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.