U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lund et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 18, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 13, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 09, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 05, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 05, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.