U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Roach v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • December 14, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.