U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 06, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.