U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dammann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.