U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gourneau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 16, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.