U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Backer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.