U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Day
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.