U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boudreau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 18, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 07, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.