U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walking Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.