U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.