U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mader
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 19, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 19, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.