U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00112
  • Case Name: First Interstate BancSystem, Inc. et al v. The Travelers Indemnity Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • December 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • November 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 11, 2022: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.