U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Cleveland v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • October 12, 2022: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.