U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Granbois, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 23, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 11, 2023: [In Limine ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 01, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • December 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 30, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 28, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 07, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Detention - MT]
  • October 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 16, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.