U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.