U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Freemont
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.