U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00115
  • Case Name: GOINS v. VALDEZ
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • October 14, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • October 14, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.