U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2023: [Judgment - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.