U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grossman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 13, 2023: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.