U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 20, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 20, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.