U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rogers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Redacted Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • January 06, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • December 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • December 09, 2022: [Compassionate Release]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.