U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:10-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rice
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.