U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:22-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dimond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 12, 2023: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 12, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 12, 2023: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.