U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chambers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
  • December 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 08, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • December 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 07, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.