U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Docket Call]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 28, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.