U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lefthand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.