U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Funk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued (Sealed) - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.